+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate