+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor