+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor