+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate