+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor