+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor