+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor