+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor