+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Rereferred to committee
- Referred to Government Organization
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
- Read first time
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate