+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/26/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor