+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (69)
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Motion to adopt conference committee report
- Point of order withdrawn
- Motion withdrawn
- House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept.
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as amended
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate