+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/5/2021
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/30/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate