+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate refuses to concur
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor