+ − Actions (55)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On January 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor