+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Higher Education
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor