+ − Actions (21)
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to House Administration
- Read first time
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On December 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor