+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/18/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor