+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor