+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/30/2019
- Left pending in committee
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/19/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor