+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/2/2019
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/2/2019
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On November 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor