+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor