+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor