+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor