+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/13/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor