+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
- Read first time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor