+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor