+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate