+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
- Read first time
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On December 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor