+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (74)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Point of order overruled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution recalling from House
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor