+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor