+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On December 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor