+ − Actions (24)
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor