+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/28/2021
- Posting rule suspended
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/27/2021
- No action taken in committee
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/18/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate