+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor