+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/10/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/6/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor