+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/11
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Natural Resources
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor