+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment withdrawn
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/29/2021
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/26/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate