+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/20/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor