+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/23/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor