+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor