+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor