+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (101)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate refuses to concur
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amended
- Point of order overruled
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
- Co-author authorized
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor