+ − Actions (14)
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On November 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor