+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor