+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (86)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment tabled
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment tabled
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment adopted as substituted
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment substituted
- Substitute amendment offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Rules suspended
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Rules suspended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Record vote
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Redistricting
- Read first time
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Reported engrossed
- Remarks ordered printed
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Redistricting, Select
- Read first time
On January 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor