+ − Actions (34)
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 3rd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On November 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor