+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor