+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (115)
On August 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On July 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) submitted
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Laid before the Senate
On July 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amended
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Co-author authorized
- Motion to suspend regular order of business
- Point of order
- Point of order overruled
- Motion to appeal ruling
- Motion fails
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
- Statement(s) submitted
- Statement(s) submitted
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
On July 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On July 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On July 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor