+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate