+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor